Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Swann Avenue Firehouse
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to alter the deadline to June 1, 2014 for the Mayor and City Council of the City of Baltimore to present evidence of a specified matching fund and to encumber funds for the grant; changing the name of the grantee from the Baltimore City Fire Department to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Baltimore; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2013 2/12/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page