Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Performance Evaluation Criteria - Default Model
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Colburn, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Jennings, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the model performance evaluation criteria adopted by the State Board of Education for the evaluation of teachers and principals are the default criteria to be used in the instance that a local school system and the exclusive employee representative fail to mutually agree to performance evaluation criteria.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM