Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of specified survivor benefits to surviving children of specified members of the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring a disabled child to receive specified survivor benefits; allowing a death benefit to be paid if special death benefits are waived; altering the distribution of special death benefits to surviving children of members of the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring a surviving disabled child to receive specified special death benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {169132/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Appropriations 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-403, 2-507, 26-402, 27-403, 29-201, 29-202, 29-203, 29-204, 29-204.1, 29-204.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM