Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit a certain report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30 each year; requiring certain State agencies to designate certain staff members to participate in certain training each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {707079/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   8-1301 through 8-1310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page