Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Indemnification
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Astle, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a rental vehicle company has a specified right of indemnification against specified persons, including a person who rents a motor vehicle, for specified property damage, personal injury, and wrongful death claims paid by the rental vehicle company that arose out of the use or operation of the motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1089
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Reassigned to Finance 31
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Referred to interim study by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM