Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders to study certain practices and procedures at certain Facilities and to make recommendations on necessary changes to improve patient treatment, training for staff, and reporting on early patient discharge; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM