Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified health care providers and specified medical laboratories to provide a specified written notice to a patient for whom the health care provider or medical laboratory performs a laboratory test for the presence of Lyme disease; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide written notice to specified committees of the General Assembly before submitting any proposed regulations under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {657374/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM