Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, King, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing specified individuals or business entities a credit against the State income tax for a specified percentage of the eligible cost of specified renewable energy property constructed or purchased and placed in service in the State; establishing a specified application fee and making the fee nonrefundable under specified circumstances; limiting the aggregate amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued during a specified period; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1548
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0809 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM