Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to changes in the nursing profession that have resulted in a shortage of nurses in the State and nation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984633/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {984633/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM