Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Provision of Professional Legal Assistance
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Attorney General shall provide legal assistance to the State Board of Elections in the performance of its duties unless the State Administrator of Elections, after consultation with the State Board, determines that because of a conflict the Attorney General may not provide legal assistance to the State Board or the State Administrator on a matter; providing that the State Administrator may retain the services of an independent legal counsel under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304831/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {304831/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-104, 2-104 through 2-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM