Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Currie, and McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a nonprofit entity that receives at least $750,000 of State aid during a fiscal year to submit a specified report to the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs on or before September 1 after the close of the fiscal year in which the State aid is received; requiring the report to contain specified information relating to the State aid and number and value of contracts between the nonprofit and certified minority business enterprises; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM