Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to apply to become a registered voter at the public or private high school where the individual is employed or enrolled; requiring the State Board of Elections to designate public and private high schools as voter registration entities; requiring certain high schools to designate faculty or staff members to distribute, at least twice a year, a voter registration application to employees and certain students who are or will be 16 years old or older during the year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-201, 3-204.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM