Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction Financing
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Energy-Efficient and Green Homes Construction Loan Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; establishing specified loan categories and criteria; establishing the Energy-Efficient and Green Homes Construction Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring the Governor to transfer a specified amount of money from the Revenue Stabilization Account to the Fund during a specified fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1489
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Finance 31
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2001 through 4-2008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM