Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland Using the Principles of Human Capital Strategy
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Recruitment, Retention, and Promotion of Teachers in Maryland Using the Principles of Human Capital Strategy; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; providing that members of the Task Force may not receive specified compensation but are entitled to specified reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Referred Senate Rules 44
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM