Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for Violations
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring Internet Web sites and electronic mail to contain specified information about licensed locksmiths under specified circumstances; requiring advertisements, directories of service providers, or search result information to include specified information about licensed locksmiths; requiring advertisers, directory publishers, or search result providers to verify with the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Referred Senate Rules 46
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12.5-401, 12.5-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM