Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morgan State University - Board of Regents - Residency Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all of the nonstudent members of the Board of Regents of Morgan State University to be residents of the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM