Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Maintenance of Effort - Property Tax Rate
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the authority of the governing body of Prince George's County to set a county property tax rate higher than the rate authorized under the county's charter for the purpose of funding the approved budget of the Prince George's County Board of Education; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Muse) Adopted 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/27/2015 3/27/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM