Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno and Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of Human Resources, to submit a report on the State's progress in determining the eligibility of applicants for long-term care services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2016 and quarterly thereafter; requiring that specified meetings be held to discuss the reports and to develop strategies to resolve ongoing issues with delays in eligibility determinations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1181
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387171/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {387171/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM