Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a local board of elections is authorized to provide election judges who are not registered with either the majority party or principal minority party and election judges who are minors.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {314335/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Election Law - Polling Places - Election Judges
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Ways and Means 46
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM