Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Muse
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act; identifying the Child Support Enforcement Administration as the support enforcement agency of the State; extending the application of specified provisions of the Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to include parties, pleadings, proceedings, and support orders of a foreign country; authorizing a tribunal of this State to exercise jurisdiction over a guardian or conservator under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118975/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Raskin) Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51
Senate 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-302, 10-303, 10-303.1, 10-304, 10-306, 10-307, 10-308, 10-309, 10-310, 10-311, 10-312, 10-312.1, 10-312.2, 10-313, 10-316, 10-317, 10-318, 10-319, 10-320, 10-322, 10-323, 10-325, 10-328, 10-329, 10-330, 10-331, 10-332, 10-332.1, 10-335 through 10-337, 10-339, 10-340, 10-341, 10-342, 10-343, 10-344, 10-345, 10-346, 10-347, 10-348, 10-349, 10-350, 10-353.1, 10-353.2, 10-354, 10-354 through 10-366, 10-355 through 10-359 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM