Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Lee, and Manno
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a court may reverse or modify the decision of an agency in specified contested cases on judicial review under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528179/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {528179/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-3)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {143825/1 Rejected (52-87)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Morhaim) Rejected (92-49)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {528179/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {528179/1 Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-3) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {143825/1 Rejected (52-87) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Morhaim) Rejected (92-49) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (89-47) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM