Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Maryland Department of the Environment jointly to study the feasibility and desirability of establishing, in whole or in part, a specified decentralized emissions inspection and testing program to implement the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program, consider matters related to emission reduction benefits under federal law, and report their findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM