Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "telephone answering service" for the purpose of establishing that the service is taxable under the sales and use tax only if the service consists exclusively of answering a telephone in a certain manner and transmitting messages to the customer; establishing that a telephone answering service is not a taxable service if certain acts are only incidental to and less than 5% of the service provider's total gross receipts in a calendar year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM