Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Benson, and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is aggrieved by a violation of specified hate crime laws may bring a civil action against the person or persons who committed the violation in a court of competent jurisdiction; authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award specified damages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0540
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0731 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM