Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Hough, and Norman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the crime of robbery includes robbing or attempting to rob another of specified controlled dangerous substances; establishing the offense of breaking and entering the storehouse of another with the intent to steal, take, or carry away controlled dangerous substances; clarifying that the crime of theft includes the theft of controlled dangerous substances; providing that a specified person shall be ordered to undergo a specified drug assessment and entered into a specified drug addiction treatment program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1362
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1137 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 3-402, 6-201, 6-203, 7-101, 7-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM