Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Rates - Reductions
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Salling, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the State income tax rate for certain income of individuals; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0854
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Rates - Reductions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax Rates - Reductions
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM