Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the Maryland Board of Physicians to issue temporary licenses to practice radiation therapy, radiography, or nuclear medicine technology; repealing specified provisions of law referring to specified temporary licenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444639/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {444639/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 52
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5B-01, 14-5B-05, 14-5B-07, 14-5B-09, 14-5B-13, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-15, 14-5B-18.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM