Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a Class 7 micro-brewery license to be issued in Cecil County; authorizing a Class 7 micro-brewery license to be issued to a holder of a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license or a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Cecil County to determine a specified ratio of gross receipts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323991/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {294734/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {323991/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-102, 17-401, 17-403, 17-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM