Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Gallion, and Cassilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of months from 6 months to 9 months that the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County may authorize for a seasonally operated licensed premises to be closed under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {703823/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Floor Amendment {703823/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
(   22-102, 22-2202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page