Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring funds in the Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund to be used for the sole purpose of completing the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park until the development of the park is complete; requiring the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners to adopt a certain plan after the development of the park is complete; altering certain distributions of revenue from the State's admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars in Calvert County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0352 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48B
Text - Third - Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 70
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM