Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Manno, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the State minimum wage rate in effect for specified time periods based on employer size; increasing, except under specified circumstances, the State minimum wage rate based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Washington-Baltimore metropolitan area; requiring the Board of Revenue Estimates during a specified time period to conduct a specified analysis; authorizing, under specified circumstances, the Governor to temporarily suspend a minimum wage rate increase; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-413, 3-413.1, 3-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM