Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting
Sponsored by
Senators Dyson and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a program in Charles County and St. Mary's County to train rifle shooters to hunt deer for the purpose of controlling the deer population in those counties; requiring the Department to give applicants who hold a Deer Management Permit priority in acceptance to the program; authorizing the Department to terminate the program under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to provide a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0259 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {130415/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Holmes) Adopted (130-3)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-6)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {744038/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 51
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {130415/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Holmes) Adopted (130-3) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-6) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-408.2, 10-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM