Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Miller, Oaks, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Court Administrator of the Administrative Office of the Courts to assess specified drug court programs to make specified determinations; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Administrative Office request an appropriation of $2,000,000 in additional funding for grants to expand the scope of drug court programs; requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to establish at least 1 crisis treatment center by June 1, 2018; authorizing the Overdose Response Program; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317377/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {316883/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Reassigned to Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {317377/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {316883/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Text - Chapter - Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-307 )
(   13-3101 through 13-3103, 13-3104, 13-3104 through 13-3106, 13-3107 through 13-3111, 13-3401, 13-3402, 16-201.3, 19-310.3, 5-901, 5-903 through 5-905, 7.5-207, 7.5-501, 8-1101, 8-407 )
(   15-850 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:36 AM