Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertising
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting growers, processors, dispensaries, independent testing laboratories, and certain third-party vendors from placing or maintaining, or causing to be placed or maintained, advertisements for medical cannabis, medical cannabis products, or medical cannabis-related services on certain mediums or locations; authorizing certifying providers to advertise the ability of the certifying provider to certify a qualifying patient to receive medical cannabis; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertising
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3313.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM