Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman, Dyson, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing and recodifying provisions of law dealing with smoke detection systems; clarifying that the installation of smoke alarms is required in specified areas of specified buildings; providing that the Act is applicable statewide; authorizing a local jurisdiction to adopt regulations; requiring a minimum number of smoke alarms be installed in specified areas; requiring a smoke alarm to activate other smoke alarms in specified circumstances; authorizing a landlord to require reimbursement from a tenant for the cost of a smoke alarm; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {324138/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 50
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {550818/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101 through 9-106, 9-107, 9-108, 9-109 )
(   10-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM