Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "artistic work" for the purpose of designating an arts and entertainment district to include original and creative work that falls into the category of graphic design, urban manufacturing, or architectural design; and eliminating the prohibition that makes inapplicable artistic work for industry-oriented or industry-related production.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1507
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-701, 4-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM