Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a delivery system for certain specialty behavioral health services, rather than for only specialty mental health services, for enrollees of managed care organizations; requiring the delivery system to assume certain financial risk; requiring the delivery system to provide certain services to certain individuals; requiring the delivery system to reimburse certain providers and collect certain data; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0938
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM