Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller to issue a winery special event permit to a Class 4 Maryland limited winery in Queen Anne's County for unlimited use for 1 day each week at specified farmers' markets in Queen Anne's County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM