Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that school vehicles used by a private, nongovernmental entity to transport specified pupils be equipped with seat belts; prohibiting a person from operating a school vehicle for a private, nongovernmental entity to transport pupils, as specified, unless the person and each occupant under 16 years old are restrained by a seat belt; providing for the application of specified requirements relating to seat belts on school vehicles; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0940
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt Requirement
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 11-174, 16-113, 22-412, 22-412.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM