Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Beidle, Edwards, Elfreth, Ferguson, Griffith, Hayes, King, McCray, Miller, Peters, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue up to $375,000,000 of bonds for the redevelopment of the Laurel Park and Pimlico racing facilities; requiring the Authority, before issuing certain bonds, to ensure certain long-term agreements are finalized; altering the distribution of proceeds from video lottery terminals to provide for the repayment of the bonds; establishing a certain Advisory Committee to provide certain recommendations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 8:29 AM