Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Montgomery County - Warren Historical Site - Loving Charity Hall
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 to provide that a specified grant for the Loving Charity Hall may not terminate before June 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: The prior authorization was altered during the 2014 Session and was amended into the Capital Budget Bill (SB 171 ).
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2007, 2009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM