Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the formula used to apportion income to the State for corporations that carry on a trade or business in and out of the State; authorizing certain corporations to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1096 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM