Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Vehicle Infrastructure - Prior Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from establishing or continuing a certain electric vehicle charging station infrastructure pilot program unless the General Assembly enacts a law authorizing the program; and establishing the intent of the General Assembly that any law related to electric vehicle charging station infrastructure take into account the use of trust fund resources available for light-duty, zero-emission vehicle supply equipment from the Volkswagen Partial Consent Decree.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Electric Vehicle Infrastructure - Prior Authorization
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM