Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that relate to the regulation of taxicabs in St. Mary's County.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0884
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   133-1 through 133-3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM