Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "item" as it relates to a certain prohibition against selling or displaying a certain obscene item to a minor by including a motion picture, an image, a visual representation, a video file, a video image, or a video recording; and providing a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and subject, for a first violation, to imprisonment of up to 1 year or a fine of up to $1,000 or both, and, for each subsequent violation, imprisonment of up to 3 years or a fine of up to $5,000 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0097
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sale or Display of Obscene Item to Minor - Video Image
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM