Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Astle, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the first $100 for one child and $200 for two or more children collected in child support in a month pass through to a family seeking assistance under the Family Investment Program; and prohibiting the consideration of that child support in computing the amount of assistance.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {927870/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-24)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {927870/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Appropriations 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {764961/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (114-24) 64
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Text - Chapter - Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM