Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Insurance Stabilization Fund and the Health Insurance Down Payment Escrow Fund; specifying the purposes of the funds; requiring, beginning on a certain date, an individual to maintain certain coverage for certain individuals; requiring that an individual pay a certain payment under certain circumstances; requiring the Exchange to take certain steps to facilitate the enrollment of certain individuals into certain coverage under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
22
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2018
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation 22
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   33-101 through 33-605 )
(   10-102.2, 2-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM