Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing
Sponsored by
Senators Pipkin and Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified funds in the Transportation Trust Fund be allocated for highway expenditures, transit expenditures, and other transportation expenditures in a specified manner; establishing the Mass Transit Account in the Transportation Trust Fund; requiring that specified revenues be credited to the Mass Transit Account; requiring that funds in the Mass Transit Account be used to pay specified costs of transit facilities and transit service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-11A-01 through 2-11A-03, 9-401 through 9-406 )
(   3-216, 7-309, 7-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM