Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Kinesiology Act
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to adopt regulations for the licensure and practice of kinesiotherapy; providing that the Act does not limit the rights of specified individuals to practice specified occupations; requiring the Board to set specified fees; establishing the Kinesiotherapy Advisory Committee; providing for the membership, powers, duties, and chair of the Committee; requiring that an individual, on or before a specified date, be licensed by the Board before the individual may practice kinesiotherapy; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0530 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/12/2014 Text - First - Maryland Kinesiology Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5F-01 through 14-5F-24 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM