Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reorganizing the Maryland Health Care Commission and the Health Services Cost Review Commission to be the Maryland Health Care and Cost Review Commission; repealing the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Health Services Cost Review Commission Fund, and related provisions of law; requiring the Commission to submit to the Governor and General Assembly by January 1, 2018, a proposal for a streamlined certificate of need process and a specified list of health care facilities and services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-101, 19-102, 19-103 through 19-108, 19-108.1, 19-109, 19-111, 19-130, 19-143, 19-144, 19-155, 19-159, 19-161, 19-163, 19-1808, 19-201 through 19-208, 19-211, 19-212, 19-213, 19-214, 19-214.1, 19-214.2, 19-214.3, 19-215 through 19-227, 19-303, 19-325, 19-326, 19-3A-03, 19-3A-07, 19-3A-08, 19-3B-04, 19-3B-05, 19-710.1, 19-710.2, 19-711.3, 19-720, 19-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM